Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Sforza

Deceased

Bishop of Tivoli, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1603Born
6 Mar 164542.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Jul 164542.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
19 Nov 164643.8AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
22 Dec 164643.9Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 164643.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
26 Jun 165653.4ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
26 Jun 165653.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
21 Apr 165956.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
21 Nov 166158.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
28 Jan 167572.0AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
24 May 167673.3DiedBishop of Tivoli, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Federico Sforza (VIAF: 89104086)
Federico Cardinal Sforza (born , died ) Bishop of Tivoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
  • a cardinal for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1646, Number 28
  • op/c1/ob: AT, 10 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017