Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyrus Straserra, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornGenova
11 Oct 165550.7AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
17 Oct 165550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
28 Apr 165651.3DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyrus Straserra:
Bishop Cyrus Straserra C.R. (died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a bishop for .5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 68
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015