Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan de Paredes, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornBurgos, Spain
1 Jan 165550.0SelectedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
2 Aug 165550.6ConfirmedBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
9 Aug 165550.6Ordained BishopBishop of Castellammare di Stabia, Italy
17 Apr 166257.3AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
22 Aug 166257.6DiedBishop of Gaeta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Paredes:
Bishop Juan de Paredes C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Gaeta

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 720
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 141, and Page 127
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 185, Number 1,153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013