Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Álvarez Barba Ossorio, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1619BornValderas, Spain
9 Sep 166950.2AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
22 Sep 166950.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
29 May 167353.9AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
4 Aug 167556.1SelectedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
22 Jun 167657.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
Oct 1688³69.3DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Álvarez Barba Ossorio:
Archbishop Alfonso Álvarez Barba Ossorio O. Carm. (born ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 128, and Page 235
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 204, Number 1,278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013