Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Satriano e Campagna

Dioecesis Satrianensis et Campaniensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Conza e Campagna



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Satriano
20 July 1098ErectedDiocese of Satriano (erected)
19 July 1525Name ChangedDiocese of Satriano
Diocese of Satriano e Campagna
19 July 1525Name ChangedDiocese of Satriano e Campagna
27 June 1818UnitedArchdiocese of Conza
Diocese of Satriano e Campagna
Archdiocese of Conza e Campagna

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Satriano
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 437
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 231
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 293
  • Diocese of Satriano e Campagna
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.7, 8 May 2021; Data: 6 Jun 2021

Quantcast