Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Fontana

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1667BornGioja
20 Sep 171043.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 171043.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Sep 171447.4AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
23 Sep 171447.4Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
30 Sep 173669.5DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Fontana:
Bishop Francesco Saverio Fontana (born , died ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a priest for 25.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1722
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 6 Jul 2015