Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pope Innocent XIII

Michelangelo dei Conti

Deceased

Pope (Roma {Rome})


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1655BornRome
13 Jun 169540.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
26 Jun 169540.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tarsus
1 Jul 169540.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
24 Mar 169842.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Portugal
7 Jun 170651.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 170953.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo, Italy
23 Feb 171155.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
1 Aug 171257.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
14 Mar 171963.8ResignedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
8 May 172165.9ElectedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
18 May 172166.0InstalledPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)
7 Mar 172468.8DiedPope (Roma {Rome}, Italy)

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo dei Conti:
Pope Michelangelo dei Conti (born , died ) Pope of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years (Elected Pope)
  • a pope for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015