Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Antonio Pini

Deceased

Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1664³BornMatera
15 Mar 168723.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 171854.1AppointedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
19 Mar 171854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy
Nov 1736³72.8DiedBishop of Polignano (Polinianum), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Antonio Pini:
Bishop Pietro Antonio Pini (born , died Nov 1736) Bishop of Polignano (Polinianum)

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 319
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015