Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giuseppe Antonio Davanzati

Deceased

Archbishop of Trani, Italy

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1665Born
20 Dec 169227.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Nov 171752.2AppointedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
28 Nov 171752.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani, Italy
6 Aug 174680.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
16 Feb 175589.4DiedArchbishop of Trani, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Davanzati
Patriarch Giuseppe Antonio Davanzati (born , died ) Archbishop of Trani

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBari

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 385
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 75
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1717, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018