Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Potenza

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1675Born
19 Sep 169924.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Sep 169924.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jan 171842.8AppointedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
16 Jan 171842.8Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
4 May 173964.1DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Potenza
Bishop Domenico Potenza (born , died ) Bishop of Montepeloso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCerignola

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast