Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Saverio Lioni

Deceased

Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1677³BornAriano
19 Dec 169922.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Dec 170225.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 171740.0AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
2 Jan 171840.1Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
22 Nov 173052.9AppointedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy
2 Dec 173356.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
5 Mar 173557.2DiedBishop of Melfi e Rapolla, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Saverio Lioni:
Archbishop Giovanni Saverio Lioni (born , died ) Bishop of Melfi e Rapolla

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1735
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 3
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 254, and Page 285

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015