Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Terzago

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1679Born
22 Sep 170323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 170324.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 171838.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ostia (-Velletri), Italy
24 Jan 171838.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Samaria
30 Jan 171838.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Samaria
29 Jan 172545.1AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
31 Aug 176181.7DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Terzago
Bishop Nicola Terzago (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 43.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280, and Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast