Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Odoardi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1674Born
21 Dec 169722.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
14 Feb 172449.1AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
25 Feb 172449.1Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
25 Jun 174166.4DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Odoardi
Bishop Agostino Odoardi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,724, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast