Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Casoni

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1645BornSarzana, Italy
3 Mar 169044.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
12 Mar 169044.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
10 Apr 169044.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
Jan 1702³56.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
17 May 170660.5Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170660.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
21 Jan 171569.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
19 Nov 172075.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Casoni (VIAF: 89065662)
Lorenzo Cardinal Casoni (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

  • a bishop for 30.6 years
  • a cardinal for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • ob/c2: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 37
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016