Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Biagio Antonio Copeti

Deceased

Bishop of Mottola (Motula)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1668³BornCampania
19 Sep 169324.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 171950.6AppointedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
21 May 171950.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy
May 1727²58.5DiedBishop of Mottola (Motula), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Biagio Antonio Copeti:
Bishop Biagio Antonio Copeti (born , died May 1727) Bishop of Mottola (Motula)

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015