Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Guidi di Bagno

Deceased

Bishop of Mantova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1683BornMantova
29 Jan 171935.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 171935.7AppointedBishop of Mantova, Italy
1 May 171935.7Ordained BishopBishop of Mantova, Italy
21 Dec 176178.3DiedBishop of Mantova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Guidi di Bagno:
Bishop Antonio Guidi di Bagno (born , died ) Bishop of Mantova

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013