Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolò Gaetano Cardinal Spínola

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1659BornMadrid, Spain
3 Oct 170647.6Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 170647.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
10 Oct 170647.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
16 Dec 171556.8Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jun 171657.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
29 Jan 172565.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
12 Apr 173576.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Gaetano Spínola:
Nicolò Gaetano Cardinal Spínola (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
  • a cardinal for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1715
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,036
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 26, Number 51
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015