Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giandomenico Cardinal Paracciani

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1646BornRome
17 May 170659.7Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170659.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
9 Jul 171467.9AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
18 Nov 171468.2Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
18 Nov 171771.2ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
9 May 172174.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giandomenico Paracciani:
Giandomenico Cardinal Paracciani (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senigallia

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
  • a cardinal for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015