Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Angelus Passante, Sch. P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1653BornTrepuzzi
19 Apr 167623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Pious Schools
9 Sep 172471.4SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
29 Jan 172571.8ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
11 Feb 172571.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
Nov 1732³79.6DiedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Angelus Passante:
Bishop Thomas Angelus Passante Sch. P. (born , died Nov 1732) Bishop of Pozzuoli

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 325
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015