Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Curlo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nebbio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1679³Born
7 Sep 171030.8Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 173353.3AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
6 Apr 173353.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbio, France
26 May 174161.5ResignedBishop of Nebbio, France
1747¹67.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Curlo
Bishop Giambattista Curlo (born , died 1747) Bishop Emeritus of Nebbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,733, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast