Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de Vico

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1660BornMacerata
19 Sep 172262.5Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 172363.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
29 Sep 172363.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
15 Jan 173574.8DiedTitular Bishop of Elusa

MicroData Summary for Francesco de Vico:
Bishop Francesco de Vico (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Elusa

  • a priest for 12.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 194
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1723, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015