Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Savageri, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

Titular Bishop of Tempe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1682BornRoma
2 Aug 170522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
14 Jun 172845.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alatri, Italy
29 Jun 172845.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
30 Mar 172946.5SucceededBishop of Alatri, Italy
13 Jan 174461.3ResignedBishop of Alatri, Italy
15 Jun 174461.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tempe
24 Jun 174764.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Alatri, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Savageri:
Bishop Ludovico Savageri C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alatri

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74, and Page 110
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015