Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Cesare Compagnoni

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1675BornMacerata
8 Dec 171439.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Feb 172549.6AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
4 Mar 172549.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
12 Apr 173256.7DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Cesare Compagnoni:
Bishop Giulio Cesare Compagnoni (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 17.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 356

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013