Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Cornaccioli, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1668Born
11 Feb 169223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
3 Jun 172658.2AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
11 Jun 172658.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
17 Jan 173768.8DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cornaccioli
Bishop Carlo Cornaccioli O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMelegnani

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017