Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Pertusati, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1679BornMediolanen
15 Jan 170222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Sep 172445.6AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
1 Oct 172445.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
17 Nov 175273.8DiedBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Pertusati:
Bishop Francesco Pertusati O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Pavia

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 306
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • d: CB, 25 Jan 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014