Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo de Mercurio

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Apr 1671Born
28 May 169524.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 173159.9SelectedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
18 Jun 173160.1ConfirmedBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
24 Jun 173160.1Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo, Italy
2 Feb 175280.8DiedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo de Mercurio
Bishop Paolo de Mercurio (born , died ) Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCamerota

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1746
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 247
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1731, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast