Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolò Leopoldo Lomellini

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1691Born
19 Dec 171625.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 172231.0AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
4 Oct 172231.1Ordained BishopBishop of Brugnato, Italy
20 Apr 175462.6DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicolò Leopoldo Lomellini
Bishop Nicolò Leopoldo Lomellini (born , died ) Bishop of Brugnato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbenga

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1723
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018