Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lazzaro Pallavicini

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Thebae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1684BornGenova, Italy
1 Dec 172036.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Dec 172036.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 172136.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thebae
16 Feb 172136.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Thebae
15 Mar 172136.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Jun 1731³46.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
28 Jun 174460.0DiedTitular Archbishop of Thebae

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lazzaro Pallavicini
Archbishop Lazzaro Pallavicini (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Thebae

  • a priest for 23.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 374
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1721, Number 5
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016