Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo de Mari, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Aleria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1673³BornSavone
1690¹16.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
28 May 169522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Jun 169724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
30 Sep 172047.6AppointedBishop of Aleria, France
13 Oct 172047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aleria, France
Jan 1741³67.9DiedBishop of Aleria, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo de Mari:
Bishop Camillo de Mari C.R. (born , died Jan 1741) Bishop of Aleria

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 76
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1720, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015