Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sinibaldo Cardinal Doria

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1664³BornGenoa
1 Nov 171147.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Nov 171147.1Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 171147.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Patrae (Veters)
21 May 173166.6AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
24 Sep 173167.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 173167.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
2 Dec 173369.1DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Sinibaldo Doria:
Sinibaldo Cardinal Doria (born , died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1731
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1711, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 309

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015