Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Francesco Codeb˛

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1665BornBologna
22 Mar 171650.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Mar 171650.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 171650.9AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
12 Jul 171651.0Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
30 Apr 173367.8DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Francesco Codeb˛:
Bishop Alessandro Francesco Codeb˛ (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

  • a priest for 17.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1716, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 4 Aug 2015