Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthias Van den Hove (Hovius)

Deceased

Archbishop of Mechelen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1542¹BornMechelen
25 Sep 159553.7AppointedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
18 Feb 159654.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium
30 May 162078.4DiedArchbishop of Mechelen, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matthias Van den Hove (Hovius):
Archbishop Matthias Van den Hove (Hovius) (died ) Archbishop of Mechelen

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 236
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013