Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathias Lambrecht

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1539¹Born
20 Dec 159556.9AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
8 Jul 159657.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
1 Jun 160263.4DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mathias Lambrecht (VIAF: 202799605)
Bishop Mathias Lambrecht (born 1539, died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSint-Laureins
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Church, Louvain
Death PlaceBruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018