Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel-Filips de Rodoan

Deceased

Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552²BornBerleghem les Audenazde
10 Jan 160048.0AppointedBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
8 Oct 160048.7Ordained BishopBishop of Middelburg, Netherlands
26 May 160351.4AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
7 Jul 161664.5DiedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Karel-Filips de Rodoan:
Bishop Karel-Filips de Rodoan (died ) Bishop of Brugge {Bruges}

  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1600, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015