Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert Maes

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1545¹Born
25 Oct 159348.8AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
7 Mar 159449.1Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
2 Jul 161469.5DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gilbert Maes (VIAF: 171703241)
Bishop Gilbert Maes (born 1545, died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBomelies
Ordained BishopLa Cour, Chapel, Bruxelles
Death PlaceBois le Duc, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 137
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast