Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Liévin (Hermann) Van der Beken (Torrentinus)

Deceased

Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1525Born
27 Oct 158661.6AppointedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
20 Sep 158762.5Ordained BishopBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium
26 Apr 159570.1DiedBishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Liévin (Hermann) Van der Beken (Torrentinus) (VIAF: 89526046)
Bishop Liévin (Hermann) Van der Beken (Torrentinus) (born , died ) Bishop of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGand
Ordained BishopNotre Dame, Abbey, Vilvorde
Death PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 111
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1587, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast