Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Lesley (Leslie)

Deceased

Bishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland

Bishop of Coutances


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1527BornKingussie
155830.2Ordained PriestPriest
156537.2SelectedBishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland, Great Britain
22 Apr 157547.5ConfirmedBishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland, Great Britain
16 Dec 159265.2AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
31 May 159668.6DiedBishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose), Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Lesley (Leslie):
Bishop John Lesley (Leslie) (born , died ) Bishop of Ross (Rosemarkie, Fortrose)

  • a priest for 38.4 years

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,520
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 287, and Page 176

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 18 Nov 2015