Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Dave

Deceased

Bishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531¹Born
20 Dec 159362.9AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
18 Sep 159463.7Ordained BishopBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
4 Mar 159564.1DiedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Dave
Bishop Jean Dave (born 1531, died ) Bishop of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNamur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}
Ordained BishopAnvers, Diocese of Antwerpen {Antwerp, Anvers}
Death PlaceNamur, Diocese of Namur {Namen}

  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 251
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1594, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018