Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques van den Borgh

Deceased

Bishop of Roermond


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹BornAmsterdam
10 Jan 161151.0AppointedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
10 Apr 161151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
24 Feb 163979.1DiedBishop of Roermond, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques van den Borgh:
Bishop Jacques van den Borgh (died ) Bishop of Roermond

  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015