Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Zoes (Zoesius)

Deceased

Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1564BornAmersfoort
2 Dec 159026.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 161550.6AppointedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
10 May 161550.7Ordained BishopBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands
22 Aug 162561.0DiedBishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Zoes (Zoesius):
Bishop Nicolas Zoes (Zoesius) (born , died ) Bishop of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc)

  • a priest for 34.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1615, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 14 Feb 2015