Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean Sarrazin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1539Born
6 Mar 159656.6SelectedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
12 Aug 159657.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Cambrai, France
15 Dec 159657.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cambrai, France
3 Mar 159858.5DiedArchbishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Sarrazin (VIAF: 249632412)
Archbishop Jean Sarrazin O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArras, Diocese of Arras
Ordained BishopLa Cour, Chapel, Bruxelles
Death PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 1.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 149
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018