Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Six

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Omer, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1532¹Born
13 Feb 158149.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Omer, France
23 Jul 158149.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Omer, France
11 Oct 158654.7DiedBishop of Saint-Omer, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Six (VIAF: 51509105)
Bishop Jean Six (born 1532, died ) Bishop of Saint-Omer

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Pierre, Douai

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018