Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathieu Moullart, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Arras, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1536Born
24 May 157740.6AppointedBishop of Arras, France
21 Sep 157741.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arras, France
11 Jul 160063.8DiedBishop of Arras, France

MicroData Summary for Mathieu Moullart (VIAF: 217495705)
Bishop Mathieu Moullart O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Arras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceS.Martin sur Cajeul, Pas de Calais
Ordained BishopS. Ghislain, Abbey, Belgium
Death PlaceBruxelles

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1577, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018