Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottavio Mirto Frangipani

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1544Born
19 Nov 157228.5AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
8 Dec 157228.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
13 Jun 158743.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
9 Mar 159247.9AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
20 Apr 159652.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
20 Jun 160561.1AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
12 Jun 160662.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Flanders, Belgium
24 Jul 161268.2DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Mirto Frangipani (VIAF: 3285521)
Archbishop Ottavio Mirto Frangipani (born , died ) Archbishop of Taranto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTaranto, Archdiocese of Taranto

  • a bishop for 39.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 327, and Page 343
  • ob/c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2011
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 267
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1572, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018