Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pamphilj (Panfili), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1525¹Born
10 Feb 157045.1AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
17 Feb 157045.1Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
20 Nov 158156.8DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pamphilj (Panfili)
Bishop Giuseppe Pamphilj (Panfili) O.S.A. (born 1525, died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVerona, Diocese of Verona

  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 300
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 16, Number 59
  • bp/bd/d: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018