Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Rusticucci

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jan 1537BornCartoceto
17 May 157033.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157033.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
16 Jun 157033.5AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
26 Nov 157033.9Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
1577¹40.0ResignedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
18 Aug 159760.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
30 Mar 159861.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
21 Feb 160063.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
19 Feb 160366.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
14 Jun 160366.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Rusticucci:
Cardinal Girolamo Rusticucci (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina

  • a bishop for 32.6 years
  • a cardinal for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 44, and Page 298
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013