Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Rusticucci

Deceased

Bishop of Fano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1566AppointedBishop of Venosa, Italy
21 Sep 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
31 Jan 1567AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
1587²DiedBishop of Fano, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Rusticucci
Bishop Francesco Rusticucci (died 1587) Bishop of Fano

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 194, and Page 330
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 10, Number 19
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,566, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast