Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Montigli

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Nov 1570AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
13 Dec 1570Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
28 Mar 1576AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
3 Aug 1591AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
27 Feb 1592ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
10 Apr 1594DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Montigli
Archbishop Carlo Montigli (died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Tryphon, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 106, and Page 336
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 18, Number 69
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Biaudet), Page 275
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1570, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018