Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Bobba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹BornCasale Monteferrato
155656.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 155757.5AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
15 Aug 155757.6Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
12 Mar 156565.2Elevated to Cardinal
8 Feb 156666.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
1568¹68.0ResignedBishop of Aosta, Italy
2 Jun 157272.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
18 Mar 157575.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Bobba:
Marcantonio Cardinal Bobba (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
  • a cardinal for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Mar 1565
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 23 Feb 2014