Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Grassi

Deceased

Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1519BornBologna
20 Dec 155537.0AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
17 May 157051.4Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 157051.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese in Agone
25 Mar 157152.2DiedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Grassi:
Cardinal Carlo Grassi (died ) Bishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a cardinal for .9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1570
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013